CA SB102 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 100500 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1367.0085, 1386, 105250.1, 120962, 120972, 127671, and 127672 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 127671) of Part 2 of Division 107 of, to add Sections 127671.1, 127672.8, 127672.9, 127673.1, 127673.2, 127673.3, 127673.4, 127673.5, 127673.6, 127673.7, 127673.8, 127673.81, 127673.82, 127673.83, 127673.84, and 127674.1 to, to repeal Sections 120512, 120780.6, 122441, and 127671.5 of, and to repeal and add Sections 127673 and 127674 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 10112.296 of, and to add Chapter 4.1 (commencing with Section 10403) to Part 2 of Division 2 of, the Insurance Code, to amend Section 19548.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 4107, 4300, 4301, 4305, 4306, 4307, 4308, 4309, 4314, 14007.8, 14011.10, 14021.51, 14042.1, 14046, 14046.1, 14079, 14105.31, 14124.24, 14134, 14188, and 14188.1 of, to amend and repeal Section 14133.22 of, to add Sections 14105.334, 14105.467, 14124.12, and 14301.11 to, to repeal Section 4315 of, and to repeal and add Sections 14046.8 and 14188.4 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public health omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB102 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 671.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |