CA SB1019 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 862, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 862, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19094 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Upholstered furniture: flame retardant chemicals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1019 Leno Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1019 Leno Senate Third Reading By GATTO (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1019 Leno (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1019 Leno Senate Third Reading By GATTO (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1019 Leno (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 862, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 4944.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 6542.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6343.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 3663.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3707.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3211.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3036.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19094 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19095 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 71113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |