CA SB1014 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 44274.4 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 5431 of, and to add Section 5450 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Clean Miles Standard and Incentive Program: zero-emission vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1014 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1014 Skinner Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - ? (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1014 Skinner (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-13 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 6133.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 7062.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 25).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and TRANS.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 4460.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4302.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 4822.) (April 24).
2018-04-23SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-23SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 24 in T. & H. pending receipt.
2018-04-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 4718.) (April 17).
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt.
2018-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-03SenateApril 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C., EQ., and T. & H.
2018-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code44274.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code44274.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code5431Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code5450New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback