CA SB1013 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on L., P.E. & R. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on L., P.E. & R. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6025 of the Penal Code and to amend Sections 14012 and 14202 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to persons with felony convictions.
Title
Persons with convictions: Board of State and Community Corrections: California Workforce Development Board: local workforce development boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on L., P.E. & R. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L., P.E. & R. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 14012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 14202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 6025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1013 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1013 |