CA SB1010 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 360, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 360, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10372 to the Public Contract Code, and to add Section 25724.4 to the Public Resources Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Air pollution: state vehicle fleet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1010 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Wilson (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1010 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1010 Skinner (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1010 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1010 Skinner (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 360, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 5331.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 3884.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3779.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3458.) (April 20). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 3. Page 3251.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10372 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25724.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |