CA SB101 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act making appropriations for the support of the government of the State of California and for several public purposes in accordance with the provisions of Section 12 of Article IV of the Constitution of the State of California, relating to the state budget, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Assembly - SB 101 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB101 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB101 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB101 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB101 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-06-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:20 a.m. | |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1577.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 2261.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-12 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-12 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-06-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 2216.) |
2023-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 485.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 357.) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |