CA SB1004 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 574, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 574, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14132.75 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health care: palliative care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1004 Hernandez Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1004 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1004 Hernandez (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1004 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1004 Hernandez (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 574, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4908.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6496.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6343.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3599.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3707.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3402.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1746 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.75 | New Code | See Bill Text |