CA AB761 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 714, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 714, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1206.5, 1209, and 3041 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to optometrists.
Title
Optometrists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 761 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB761 Roger Hernández By Hernandez (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #15 AB761 Roger Hernández (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Assembly - AB 761 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB761 Roger Hernández By Hernandez (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #15 AB761 Roger Hernández (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Assembly - AB 761 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 714, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6528.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4883.). | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-09 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2012-08-09 | Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-06 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-07-06 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4321.). | |
2012-07-05 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). | |
2012-06-21 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-06-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-05-30 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-01-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-01-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3604.) | |
2012-01-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-23 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-01-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19). | |
2012-01-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-01-13 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-01-12 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-01-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 10). | |
2012-01-10 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-01-05 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3434.) (Pending re-referral to Com. on HEALTH.) | |
2012-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-04-26 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and HEALTH. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1206.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |