CA AR89 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-30 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5277.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-30 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5277.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Agriculture Day.
Title
Relative to California Agriculture Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - HR 89 Eggman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5277.). |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12). |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | Introduced. |