CA AR80 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-29 - Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-29 - Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Statewide Communities Development Authority.
Title
Relative to California Statewide Communities Development Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Amended. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180HR80 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180HR80 |