CA AR45 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2548.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the 4th of July.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the 4th of July.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-05 - Assembly - HR 45 Maienschein Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-05AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2548.).
2019-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 1).
2019-06-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-06-18AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback