CA AR33 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-3)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2161.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-3)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2161.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Pride Month.
Title
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Pride Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 2161.). |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Introduced. |