CA AR18 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-17-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Read. Adopted. (Page 958.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-17-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Read. Adopted. (Page 958.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Vaisakhi.
Title
Relative to Vaisakhi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 958.). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | Introduced. |