CA AR17 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2479.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2479.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Arirang Day.
Title
Relative to Arirang Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-23 - Assembly - HR 17 Choi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2479.). |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | Introduced. |