CA AR121 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Overdose Awareness Week.
Title
Relative to Overdose Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | Introduced. |