CA AR117 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to immigration.
Title
Relative to immigration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | Introduced. |