CA AR11 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-21)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 653.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 653.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Women in the United States Armed Forces.
Title
Relative to Women in the United States Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 653.). |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced. |