CA AR11 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 51. Noes 17. Page 905.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 51. Noes 17. Page 905.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to domestic worker rights.
Title
Relative to domestic worker rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Assembly - HR 11 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 51. Noes 17. Page 905.). | |
2011-03-31 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 30). | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2011-03-07 | Introduced. |