CA AJR8 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to public social services.
Title
Public social services: Social Security, Medicare, and Medicaid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR8 Kalra et al. By Wiener (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AJR 8 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AJR 8 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 3. Page 1803.) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 0. Page 1643.) |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and HEALTH. |
2017-03-24 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |