CA AJR6 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to elder citizens.
Title
Elder Economic Security Standard Index.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR6 Beall By Liu (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Assembly - AJR6 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Assembly - AJR6 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-09-01 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2009-08-25 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-08-24 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1916.) | |
2009-06-25 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |
2009-04-02 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-04-02 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 12. Page 756.) | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 31). | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | |
2009-02-19 | From printer. | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced. To print. |