CA AJR5 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transportation.
Title
Transportation revenues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR5 Bonnie Lowenthal By DeSaulnier (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Assembly - AJR5 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Assembly - AJR5 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-06-08 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | |
2011-06-06 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-06-06 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 1306.) | |
2011-05-11 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 10). | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-03-30 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-29 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 16. Page 726.) | |
2011-03-22 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (March 21). | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-02-11 | From printer. | |
2011-02-10 | Introduced. To print. |