CA AJR47 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-5-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-31 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-31 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to climate change and coastal resources.
Title
Climate change and coastal resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AJR 47 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 4. Page 7045.) |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6560.) |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |