CA AJR38 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to military and veterans.
Title
Fair employment and housing: military and veteran status.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AJR38 Salas (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AJR 38 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AJR 38 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-07-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4252.) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4832.) |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |