CA AJR35 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-18-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Measure version as amended on April 26 corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Measure version as amended on April 26 corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a Polish law on speech related to the Holocaust.
Title
Polish law: Holocaust speech.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AJR 35 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Measure version as amended on April 26 corrected. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5375.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |