CA AJR34 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-8)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-8)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to agricultural labor shortages.
Title
Agricultural workers: labor shortages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR34 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Cannella (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - AJR 34 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - AJR 34 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 5649.) |
2018-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 5964.) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Amended. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-03-02 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |