CA AJR33 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-24-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-24-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Port Chicago 50.
Title
Port Chicago disaster: African American Sailors of the
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AJR33 Bonilla (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Be adopted and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AJR 33 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Be adopted and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AJR 33 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4644.) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4675.) |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |