CA AJR26 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 196, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 196, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Confederate flag and symbols.
Title
Removal of the Confederate flag and symbols.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-08 - Assembly - AJR 26 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR26 Weber By Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Assembly - AJR 26 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR26 Weber By Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Assembly - AJR 26 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-21 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 196, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-09-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2947.). |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2505.) |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2465.) |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |