CA AJR18 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-17)
Status: Passed on August 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-17)
Status: Passed on August 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to nuclear fuel.
Title
Spent nuclear fuel: storage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR18 Davies et al. By Blakespear (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-08-13 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Assembly - AJR 18 Davies Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-13 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Assembly - AJR 18 Davies Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-23 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) |
2024-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 13). |
2024-08-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-08-06 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-08-05 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0.) |
2024-08-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |