CA AJR17 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-19)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-19)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to military behavioral health care.
Title
Military behavioral health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar AJR17 Waldron et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - AJR 17 Waldron Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - AJR 17 Waldron Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-28 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4307.) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4260.) |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |