CA ACR94 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to First Lady Nancy Davis Reagan.
Title
First Lady Nancy Davis Reagan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR94 Valladares By Wilk (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Assembly - ACR 94 Valladares Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Assembly - ACR 94 Valladares Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-07 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 2226.) |
2021-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 5. Page 2306.) |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |