CA ACR92 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-21)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Sen. Toni Atkins [D]
Sen. Patricia Bates [R]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Sen. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Sen. Shannon Grove [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Sen. Connie Leyva [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Sen. Nancy Skinner [D]
Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Assembly - ACR 92 Waldron Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-05-22AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1831.)
2019-05-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-05-07AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback