CA ACR85 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-28)
Status: Passed on September 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-28)
Status: Passed on September 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to New United Motor Manufacturing, Inc.
Title
New United Motor Manufacturing, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR85 Torrico By Corbett (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-09-16 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-03 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-09-02 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 2120.) | |
2009-08-20 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |
2009-07-24 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-07-24 | From printer. Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2566.) | |
2009-07-23 | Introduced. To print. |