CA ACR82 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-15-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-15-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Juneteenth.
Title
Juneteenth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-15 - Senate - Special Consent ACR82 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-20 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1993.) |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2014.) |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |