CA ACR78 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-23)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Small Business Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR78 Baker et al. By Wilk (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2017.
2017-06-06AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-05-26SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1223.)
2017-05-17SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-09SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-05-08AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1427.)
2017-05-08AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-04AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4).
2017-05-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-04-26AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback