CA ACR72 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-18-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-18-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to veterans.
Title
Veterans of the Republic of Vietnam Armed Forces Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-05 - Senate - Special Consent ACR72 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - ACR 72 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - ACR 72 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-15 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1806.) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1955.) |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |