CA ACR60 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-18-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Black April Memorial Month.
Title
Black April Memorial Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1253.) |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |