CA ACR56 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-19-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Holocaust Memorial Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]Sen. Josh Becker [D]
Sen. Steve Glazer [D]Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]Sen. Josh Newman [D]Sen. Susan Rubio [D]
Sen. Henry Stern [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent ACR56 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2021.
2021-05-07 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2021-04-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-04-29SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.)
2021-04-27SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-04-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-12SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-04-08AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-04-08AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 25).
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-03-23AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback