CA ACR54 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-18)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Holocaust Memorial Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Sen. Steve Glazer [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Sen. Susan Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]
Sen. Henry Stern [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Special Consent ACR54 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2019.
2019-05-22AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
2019-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-05-16SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1060.)
2019-05-13SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-08SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-30SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-04-29AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1398.)
2019-04-29AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2019-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-03-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback