CA ACR54 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Holocaust Memorial Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-03-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback