CA ACR49 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-17-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-17-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Arts Education Month.
Title
Arts Education Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent ACR49 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - ACR 49 Choi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - ACR 49 Choi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-05-03 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 793.) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 18). |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |