CA ACR47 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-26-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-26-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to 529 College Savings Day.
Title
529 College Savings Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR47 Chau By Lara (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1122.) |
2015-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1375.) |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |