CA ACR31 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-18-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-18-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Family Justice Centers.
Title
Family Justice Centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Special Consent ACR31 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Assembly - ACR 31 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Assembly - ACR 31 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-04-07 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 578.) |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 25). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |