CA ACR31 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-16-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-16-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Community College Month.
Title
California Community College Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent ACR31 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1006.) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1162.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Amended. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |