CA ACR269 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-24)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 192, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Dosan Ahn Chang Ho Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dosan Ahn Chang Ho Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Sen. Jeff Stone [R]Sen. Andy Vidak [R]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Travis Allen [R]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]

Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR269 Choi et al. By Vidak (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 192, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5888.)
2018-08-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-14SenateIntroduced measure version corrected.
2018-08-14SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-08-13AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 6251.)
2018-08-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-09AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 9).
2018-08-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-07AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-08-06AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback