CA ACR267 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-26)
Status: Passed on September 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California’s Sikh American Awareness and Appreciation Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California’s Sikh American Awareness and Appreciation Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Bob Wieckowski [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR267 Kalra et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5941.)
2018-08-24SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-08-20AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 6387.)
2018-08-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 13).
2018-08-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-07AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2018-08-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-07-06AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-07-05AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback