CA ACR258 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-21-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-21-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Pre-Exposure Prophylaxis and Post-Exposure Prophylaxis Awareness Day.
Title
Pre-Exposure Prophylaxis and Post-Exposure Prophylaxis Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR258 Gloria et al. By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5663.) |
2018-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6308.) |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 9). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |