CA ACR216 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-17)
Status: Passed on August 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 182, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-17)
Status: Passed on August 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 182, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Hindu American Awareness and Appreciation Month.
Title
California Hindu American Awareness and Appreciation Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-19 - Assembly - ACR 216 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Special Consent ACR216 Kalra et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - ACR 216 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Special Consent ACR216 Kalra et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - ACR 216 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 182, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-26 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) |
2024-08-13 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-07 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-14 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |