CA ACR215 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-22)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 206, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the 23 Asilomar AI Principles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

23 Asilomar AI Principles.

Sponsors

Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR215 Kiley et al. By Moorlach (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-14 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-07AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 206, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6054.)
2018-08-14SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2018-07-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-26SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-06-25AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 5963.)
2018-06-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2018-04-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-04-06AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-04-05AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback