CA ACR185 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Native American Day.
Title
California Native American Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-09-01 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR185 Cook (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-17 - Assembly - ACR 185 COOK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-17 - Assembly - ACR 185 COOK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-16 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | |
2010-09-01 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-09-01 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5121.) | |
2010-08-31 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-17 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-08-17 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6299.) | |
2010-08-12 | Referred to Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (August 12). | |
2010-08-10 | From printer. | |
2010-08-09 | Introduced. To print. |