CA ACR174 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Roberto "Bobby" Salcedo Memorial Highway.
Title
Roberto "Bobby" Salcedo Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Assembly - ACR 174 ENG Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR174 Eng (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-10 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Assembly - ACR 174 ENG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR174 Eng (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-10 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Assembly - ACR 174 ENG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-09 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |
2010-08-26 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6708.) | |
2010-08-24 | Passed on file. | |
2010-08-20 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2010-08-20 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4715.) | |
2010-08-18 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-17 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-16 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-08-12 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 10). | |
2010-08-05 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-08-02 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-08-02 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6006.) | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (June 30). | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21). | |
2010-06-15 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-06-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-06-08 | From printer. | |
2010-06-07 | Introduced. To print. |